U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10013
  • Case Name: Paul W. Techiera
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Approving Report on Conversion]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Statement of Intent]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Statement of Intent]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
April, 2018
  • April 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Employ]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Employ]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.