U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20008
  • Case Name: William R Perusse and Virginia M Perusse
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2018
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Approving Final Report & Account]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Distribution]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement Cover Sheet]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
  • March 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.