U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10014
  • Case Name: Daniel W. Toby, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
January, 2019
  • January 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Withdraw Document]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Document]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Continue Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Fees Due]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Withdraw Document]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Objection]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
June, 2018
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Defer Payment]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Defer Fee]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Document]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.