U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10020
  • Case Name: Alex N Small
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
October, 2018
  • October 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismissing Case]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Show Cause]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Assign Judge and Trustee Special Event]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Severing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.