U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10016
  • Case Name: Andrew Bouchard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
August, 2018
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Memorandum]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
April, 2018
  • April 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • January 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Assign Judge and Trustee Special Event]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Entry]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Document]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.