U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20010
  • Case Name: QAD Investments, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Compensation]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Compromise Controversy]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Certificate of Service]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Compromise Controversy]
February, 2019
  • February 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
January, 2019
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay Consented]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Proposed Order]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Objection]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • February 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Response]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Consent]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Expedite Hearing]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset Business]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.