U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10121
  • Case Name: Andrea L Small
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Document]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Statement of Intent]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Statement of Intent]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Show Cause]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Vacating Order]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • February 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Document]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Order on Severed Case]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sever Chapter 13 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.