U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20013
  • Case Name: Silverbull Software LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Document]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset Business]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.