U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20015
  • Case Name: Deborah Marie Fanning
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
February, 2018
  • February 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismissing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • January 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.