U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10026
  • Case Name: Camden Hills Farm By-The-Sea LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Affidavit]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Emergency Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Matrix]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Assign Judge and Trustee Special Event]
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Order to Comply]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.