U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10027
  • Case Name: Nicholas David McIntyre
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Proposed Order]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • January 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.