U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02001
  • Case Name: Rodriguez Remodeling, LLC v. Moradi et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Memorandum]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • May 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Witness List]
March, 2019
  • March 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set (pdf - Finding of facts)]
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Mediation Held]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Mediation Set]
  • November 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Referral for Mediation Order]
  • November 08, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Memorandum]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
  • October 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amend]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amend]
March, 2018
  • March 24, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 20, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.