U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20033
  • Case Name: John Cleveland Lyons and Christine Elizabeth Lyons
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Convert Case 13 to 07]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approve Loan Modification]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approve Loan Modification]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Modify Plan]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
December, 2018
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Deduct Wages]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Deduct Wages]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Modify Plan]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Deduct Wages]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Deduct Wages]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • February 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.