U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20042
  • Case Name: David E. Begos, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.