U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10042
  • Case Name: Arol Dean Crocker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Discharging Debtor]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Proposed Order]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge]
April, 2018
  • April 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.