U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20045
  • Case Name: Derek R. Libby and Kathryn G. Skinner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Pay]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Pay ]
March, 2018
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amend Application]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Application]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Consent]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedules and Statements]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order to Comply]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Entry]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.