U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10043
  • Case Name: Elaine T. Cousins and Arnold F. Cousins, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Application for Redaction of Personal Identifiers (Fee Per Case)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Matrix]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Schedules and Statements]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Document]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Supplemental Document]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Schedules and Statements]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Order to Comply]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.