U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10044
  • Case Name: Keith Hamel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Installment Payment (Final) (Chapter 07)]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Installment Payment #3 (Chapter 07)]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Installment Payment #2 (Chapter 07)]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Installment Payment #1 (Chapter 07)]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.