U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20048
  • Case Name: Gary Arthur Gomes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Operating Report]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Document]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.