U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02002
  • Case Name: Cote v. Thibodeau
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • February 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 05, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Sua Sponte Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.