U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02003
  • Case Name: Manhart, Chapter 7 Trustee v. Forest Avenue Buildings, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stay]
  • May 10, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stay ]
April, 2018
  • April 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 04, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • March 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.