U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10052
  • Case Name: Felicity A. Ferrell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Request for Change of Address]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Written Opinion]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reconsider]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sua Sponte Order]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Written Opinion]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Final Order re: Appeal]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Transmittal of Record on Appeal]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Exhibit]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Transcript]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Appellant Designation]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript of Testimony]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Appeal Transmission Form]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Exhibit]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sanctions]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sell]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Witness List]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Exhibit List]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Stipulation]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Affidavit]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Exhibit]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Affidavit]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sell]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reply]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Exhibit]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Emergency Hearing]
  • February 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Emergency Hearing]
  • February 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.