U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10054
  • Case Name: Francis J. Nichols
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement Cover Sheet]
June, 2018
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.