U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10057
  • Case Name: Kevin C. Himes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Declaration]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2018
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.