U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20057
  • Case Name: Michael Robert MacDonald and Lori Jean MacDonald
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
July, 2018
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • April 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Extend Time]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Document]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Document]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Matrix]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Reconsider Dismissal of Case]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Dismissing Case]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.