U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20058
  • Case Name: Daniel H Pusey and Cheryl A. Pusey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Change of Address]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Consent]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Statement of Intent]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reply]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
May, 2018
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Document]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.