U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10058
  • Case Name: Krista L. Niezelski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2019
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Approving Final Report & Account]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Distribution]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2018
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.