U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10062
  • Case Name: Linda Mildred Carvell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Request for Change of Address]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Request for Change of Address]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Statement of Intent]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Matrix]
  • February 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.