U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20067
  • Case Name: Betsy Lee O'Brien
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Supplemental Document]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Document]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Documents]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Tax Documents]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.