U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20068
  • Case Name: Iqbal Hossain
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Declaration]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Adequate Protection]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.