U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20070
  • Case Name: Eric D. Patino
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
May, 2019
  • May 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Operating Report]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
May, 2018
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
February, 2018
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Schedules and Statements]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Document]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.