U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10077
  • Case Name: Eddie Cabassa
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.