U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20086
  • Case Name: Frank A. Foster and Lora L. Foster
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
June, 2018
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Denying Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Document]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Document]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Order on Document]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.