U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10083
  • Case Name: Jill A Schnedler
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedule G]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Declaration]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Application for Redaction of Personal Identifiers (Fee Per Case)]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Application for Redaction of Personal Identifiers (Fee Per Case)]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.