U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20090
  • Case Name: Megan M. Rinko
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.