U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10095
  • Case Name: Joyce Curtis and Dean Curtis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • February 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Approving Report on Conversion]
January, 2019
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approve Loan Modification]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Approve Loan Modification]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Convert Case 13 to 07]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Application for Redaction of Personal Identifiers (Fee Per Case)]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • March 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.