U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20097
  • Case Name: Tracy Robertson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Change of Address]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Exhibit]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.