U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20103
  • Case Name: Natalie J. Bradway
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • May 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
May, 2018
  • May 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Document]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.