U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20107
  • Case Name: Katherine Coffin Mills
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Document]
  • March 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.