U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10102
  • Case Name: Ronnie L Lytle, II and Tina M Lytle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Document]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Objection to Claim of Exempt Property]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.