U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20112
  • Case Name: Tommy Michel Bureau
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.