U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20115
  • Case Name: Deborah Marie Fanning
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismissing Case]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.