U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00066
  • Case Name: EWALT v. PROCK MARINE COMPANY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.