U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20122
  • Case Name: Shannon E. MacVane
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
March, 2018
  • March 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.