U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02004
  • Case Name: Wilson, Jr v. LVNV Funding LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • May 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Show Cause]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.