U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00490
  • Case Name: BAILEY v. DAL GLOBAL SERVICES LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order]
  • January 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Objection]
  • August 16, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • August 16, 2018: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.