U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10116
  • Case Name: Heidi Sweetwater
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Withdraw Document]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Fees Due]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.