U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00117
  • Case Name: WEBB v. CALAIS REGIONAL HOSPITAL
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2019
  • March 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.