U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10122
  • Case Name: Bernard W Kirouac and Diane I Kirouac
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule A/B]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Social Security Number]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Social Security Number]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.