U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20136
  • Case Name: William Robert Sprague and Noreen Ellen Sprague
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.